Dogfen lywodraethu DIAL A RIDE (SCARBOROUGH & DISTRICT)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 DECEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 JULY 2009. as amended on 11 Sep 2019 as amended on 09 Sep 2020 as amended on 01 Apr 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF SCARBOROUGH, FILEY, WHITBY, ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND RYEDALE DISTRICT, WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, LOW EDUCATIONAL ATTAINMENT, LONG TERM UNEMPLOYMENT OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Maes buddion
SCARBOROUGH, FILEY, WHITBY ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND RYEDALE DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.