Dogfen lywodraethu BECHANGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/01/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/02/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF EAST KENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES , VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS: (B) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES TO BENEFIT THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Maes buddion
AYLESHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.