Dogfen lywodraethu ESSEX & HERTS AIR AMBULANCE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 MAY 2006, 12 DECEMBER 2006, 16 APRIL 2007, 22 JUNE 2007 AND 20 JANUARY 2009 AND 23 FEBRUARY 2010 as amended on 22 Mar 2018 as amended on 22 May 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To assist in relieving pain and sickness by the operation of a pre-hospital emergency medical service for the counties of Essex and Hertfordshire and surrounding areas. This service provided mainly by a helicopter emergency medical service with additional rapid response vehicles and to perform such other charitable purposes for the relief of pain and sickness consistent with the above object as the Trustees shall at their discretion determine.
Maes buddion
ESSEX AND HERTFORDHSIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.