Dogfen lywodraethu THE SOCIAL MOBILITY FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 2006 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 JULY 2006 AND 8 NOVEMBER 2006 as amended on 30 Apr 2020 as amended on 07 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects (the “Objects”) are to advance the education of disadvantaged young people in the United Kingdom in particular, but not exclusively by: 3.1.1 affording opportunities to obtain internships and other work experience with organisations working in the professions and the fields of commerce, banking, financial services, industry and administration or such other fields as the Trustees in their absolute discretion see fit; and 3.1.2 advising and assisting young people to enter and progress in careers in the professions and the fields of commerce, banking, financial services, industry and administration or such other fields as the Trustees in their absolute discretion see fit.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON AND GREATER LONDON.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.