Dogfen lywodraethu PARA DANCE UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/08/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 OCT 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
.THE OBJECTS OF THE WDSA (UK) IS THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND SPORTING FACILITIES IN THE FORM OF INCLUSIVE DANCE, PARA DANCE SPORT AND WHEELCHAIR DANCE SPORT IN ALL ITS FORM.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.