Dogfen lywodraethu SUSSEX COUNTY SPORTS PARTNERSHIP TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 NOV 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE INCREASED COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SUSSEX IN PARTICULAR BY (A) STRATEGIC PLANNING AND COORDINATION WITHIN AND BETWEEN LOCAL ORGANISATIONS OR COMMUNITY SPORTS NETWORKS, INCLUDING THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS IN THE MANAGEMENT AND PROJECT PLANNING OF SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION; (B) THE MARKETING AND COMMUNICATION OF SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION INFORMATION AND OPPORTUNITIES; (C) THE BENEFITS AND OUTCOMES OF INVESTMENT IN SPORTS AND ACTIVE RECREATION THROUGH ROBUST PERFORMANCE MEASUREMENT SYSTEMS; (D) THE SUPPORT OF ORGANISATIONS AND LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN HELPING PEOPLE START STAY AND SUCCEED IN SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION TO WHATEVER LEVEL THEY CHOOSE; (E) THE AWARENESS OF COMMUNITY SPORTS ORGANISATIONS OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER RESOURCES WHICH ARE OPEN TO THEM; (F) THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ALL PEOPLE, BOTH VOLUNTARY OR PROFESSIONAL, INVOLVED IN THE COMMUNITY SPORT INFRASTRUCTURE; (G) THE IMPROVEMENT AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION; (H) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN 3 (A) TO (G) ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
SUSSEX
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.