Dogfen lywodraethu THE AVENUES TRUST GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/08/2013 as amended on 10 Aug 2018 as amended on 12 May 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE, AND TO ASSIST IN THE SUPPORT AND PROMOTION OF, THE INTELLECTUAL, EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, ELDERLY PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, COMPLEX NEEDS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, SENSORY IMPAIRMENTS, AUTISM, MENTAL ILLNESS, MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS, LONG TERM ILLNESS AND ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.