Dogfen lywodraethu SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE WORK CLUBS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEP 2011 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2012 as amended on 22 Nov 2018 as amended on 15 Nov 2019 as amended on 23 Jan 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The charity?s objects (?the objects?) are charitable in nature and are: ? Support to unemployed individuals of South Staffordshire to help them back into work: includes CV writing, Interview skills, workshops, talks from local companies, employability and confidence building courses ? Support for South Staffordshire residents through IT training, benefits, budgeting and debt for these individuals ? To create supportive environment to ensure that individuals feel less isolated in their community.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.