Dogfen lywodraethu NORTH WEST REGION OF U3AS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2014 as amended on 14 Sep 2021 as amended on 14 Sep 2021 as amended on 18 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1. The Network’s object is the advancement of education and in particular the education of older people and those retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in the Network Area. This will be mainly undertaken by providing support and assistance to the University of the Third Age organisations [u3as] in the Network Area.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.