Elusennau cysylltiedig SAMARITANS OF LIVERPOOL AND MERSEYSIDE
Rhif yr elusen: 1171022
Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 03/06/1971
AS AMENDED ON 14/06/1991
AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2007
AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2011
AS AMENDED ON 02 DEC 2015
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN LIVERPOOL AND MERSEYSIDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATION AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2. TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Maes buddion
LIVERPOOL AND MERSEYSIDE
Hanes cofrestru
- 17 Rhagfyr 1965 : Cofrestrwyd
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.