Dogfen lywodraethu New Model Institute for Technology and Engineering
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 APR 2015 as amended on 17 Dec 2019 as amended on 20 Sep 2021 as amended on 20 Sep 2021 as amended on 12 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. OBJECTS 3.1 The Institute's objects ("Objects") are specifically restricted to the following: 3.1.1 to advance education, with a particular focus on engineering and related business skills, and to widen participation in higher education by underrepresented groups and those who are socially excluded; and 3.1.2 to promote research for the public benefit and to publish the useful results.
Maes buddion
HEREFORDSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.