Dogfen lywodraethu ADOPTION MATTERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/02/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/08/2014 as amended on 09 Oct 2020 as amended on 20 Sep 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
“4.1 The Charity’s Object is specifically restricted to the following: 4.1.1 to promote the care and welfare of vulnerable children without parents or families able to look after them primarily, but not exclusively, through the provision of a high-quality adoption service with the aim of securing permanent homes and stable lives for such children; and 4.1.2 in furthering the Object the Charity shall have regard to the principles of the Christian faith.”
Maes buddion
DIOCESE OF CHESTER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.