Dogfen lywodraethu HILLINGDON AUTISTIC CARE & SUPPORT LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 MAY 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH AUTISM, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF CARE, TREATMENT OF EDUCATION AND CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH AUTISM TO SECURE FOR THEM PROVISION COMMENSURATE WITH THEIR NEEDS. TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.