Dogfen lywodraethu VOLUNTEER CENTRE TAMESIDE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 18 JUNE 1986, 26 JUNE 1989 AND 22 NOVEMBER 1989, 25 SEPTEMBER 1995, AND 14TH MARCH 2000, AND 15TH DECEMBER 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE VOLUNTEER CENTRE ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF TAMESIDE BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER VOLUNTEERS AND ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROTECT HEALTH, RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THOUGH: A)PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING B) THE PROVISION OF A VOLUNTEER CENTRE C)GIVING ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO VOLUNTEERS D) GIVING ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS IN THE INVOLVEMENT OF VOLUNTEERS IN FURTHERING THE ORGANISATIONS CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Maes buddion
TAMESIDE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.