Dogfen lywodraethu VOLUNTARY ACTION BARNSLEY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/05/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/10/2012 as amended on 30 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF BARNSLEY METROPOLITAN BOROUGH (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN THE CHARITY REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
BARNSLEY METROPOLITAN BOROUGH.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.