Dogfen lywodraethu WOLVERHAMPTON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 17 JULY 1995, 21 FEBRUARY 2003 AND 19 MARCH 2004 as amended on 09 Jul 2019 as amended on 11 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF DUDLEY, CITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND ADJACENT AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.