Dogfen lywodraethu BIRMINGHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU SERVICE LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21ST MAY 2002 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 6TH NOVEMBER 2002 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 NOV 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Maes buddion
BIRMINGHAM, HEREFORD AND WORCESTER, SHROPSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE, THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICTS OF BIRMINGHAM, COVENTRY, DUDLEY, SANDWELL, SOLIHULL, WALSALL, WOLVERHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.