Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRADGATE PARK AND SWITHLAND WOOD CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 04 SEP 1980 AS AMENDED ON 08 DEC 2008 AS AMENDED ON 08 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 19 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 2020 as amended on 10 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC PARK AND RECREATION GROUND AND THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT THEREOF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE AND OF VISITORS THERETO, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS AND B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CARE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME).
Maes buddion
COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.