Dogfen lywodraethu GRESFORD & DISTRICT WAR MEMORIAL COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONVEYANCES DATED 10TH MAY 1949, 8TH OCTOBER 1952, 28TH JANUARY 1953, 3RD JUNE 1959. DEEDS OF EXCHANGE DATED 20TH JUNE 1952 AND 3RD JUNE 1959.AND SCHEME OF 21ST NOVEMBER 1995. as amended on 08 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE PURPOSE OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES , CLASSES, RECREATION AND ENTERTAINMENT OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
THE PARISHES OF GRESFORD,MARFORD AND HOSELEY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.