Dogfen lywodraethu THE CHILDREN'S LEUKAEMIA TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 AUGUST 1990 AS VARIED BY DEEDS OF APPOINTMENT DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1990, 21 OCTOBER 1991 & 23 APRIL 1992 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT 22 APRIL 1992
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROVIDE CLINICAL CARE AND TREATMENT FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN WITH LEUKAEMIA INCLUDING THOSE UNDERGOING BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF MODERN PROTECTIVE ISOLATION FACILITIES WITH AIR FILTRATION AND QUALIFIED NURSING STAFF 2) TO PROVIDE FINANCE TO SUPPORT BASIC LABORATORY RESEARCH INTO LEUKAMEMIA INCLUDING INTER ALIA RESEARCH INTO BONE MARROW TRANSPLANT IMMUNOBIOLOGY INCLUDING THE COMPLICATION OF GRAFT VERSUS HOST DISEASE AND THE BENEFICIAL PHENOMENON OF GRAFT VERSUS LEUKAEMIA
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.