Dogfen lywodraethu TOUCHSTONE-LEEDS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 OCTOBER 1991, 28 SEPTEMBER 1992, 20 OCTOBER 1995 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 JANUARY 1995
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE THE FOSTERING OF POSITIVE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND THE PREVENTION OF BREAKDOWN AMONG THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY BY ESTABLISHING, GUIDING AND SUPPORTING THE PROMOTION OF SELF HELP GROUPS, AND PROVISION OF PERSONAL COUNSELLING, HOUSING AND OTHER PRACTICAL FACILITIES AND BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF LAY AND PROFESSIONAL HEALTH CARE WORKERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.