Dogfen lywodraethu GUILDHE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 APR 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAY 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 NOV 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 NOV 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 SEP 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 NOV 2015 as amended on 30 Jan 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE EFFICIENCY OF CHARITABLE COLLEGES OF HIGHER EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN DIRECT FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS BY THE PROMOTION OF DISCUSSION AND CONSULTATION, THE FORMULATION OF POLICIES AND THE PROVISION OF REPRESENTATION, INFORMATION ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.