Dogfen lywodraethu REFUGEE AND MIGRANT JUSTICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 27TH AUGUST 1992, 1ST OCTOBER 1993, 26TH SEPTEMBER 1996, 23RD SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 24TH SEPTEMBER 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PERSONS SEEKING ENTRY TO OR LEAVE TO REMAIN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. FOR ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN CONNECTION WITH THEIR APPLICATIONS TO THE IMMIGRATION AUTHORITIES AND FOR ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION WITH HEARINGS AND APPEALS ARISING FROM SUCH APPLICATIONS AND WHO BY REASON OF THEIR INADEQUATE MEANS ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FROM THEIR OWN RESOURCES; TO EDUCATE AND PROVIDE INFORMATION TO THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO IMMIGRATION LAW, PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.