Dogfen lywodraethu BREAST CANCER CARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 NOV 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JAN 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 APR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 SEP 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 MAR 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 JUL 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 APR 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 ADVANCE HEALTH, INCLUDING THE HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, PATIENTS RECEIVING TREATMENT, THOSE CONVALESCING FOLLOWING TREATMENT BY: 3.1.1 PROMOTING ACTIVITIES WHICH WILL ASSIST WITH AWARENESS, IDENTIFICATION AND PREVENTION OF CANCER, 3.1.2 ASSISTING THOSE INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE DISABLED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE, 3.2 ADVANCE THE HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS BY UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CANCER ON TERMS THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED, 3.3 ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE NATURE OF CANCER AND ITS TREATMENTS PARTICULARLY (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THAT GENERALITY) AMONG SUFFERERS OF CANCER AND THE FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS OF SUCH PERSONS, AND 3.4 PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS CONCERNED WITH MEDICAL RESEARCH OR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL IN THEIR ABOSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.