Dogfen lywodraethu NORTHERN CONSORTIUM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/02/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/2005 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14/02/2013 as amended on 07 Sep 2017 as amended on 04 Apr 2019 as amended on 19 Oct 2020 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 15 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The advancement of education in particular but not limited to: 1. Administering or procuring, directly or indirectly, education projects and training programmes; 2. Running, funding or supporting collaborative teaching projects with both UK and overseas educational institutions or other organisations attended by students from the UK or overseas, making further or higher education more accessible for students from different backgrounds and geographical locations; 3. Providing bursaries, scholarships, counselling, placements, training opportunities or other support to UK or overseas students who are either disadvantaged (financially or otherwise) or from under-represented groups.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.