Dogfen lywodraethu INDEPENDENT LIVING (EXTENSION) FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 31 MARCH 1997, 13 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 12 JUNE 2002 AND BY SCHEME DATED 2 NOVEMBER 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
DURING THE TRUST PERIOD THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE SAME AND THE INCOME THEREOF AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT: (A)UNTIL AND INCLUDING 31ST MARCH FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE PERSONS INCAPACITATED BY OR OTHERWISE SUFFERING FROM VERY SEVERE DISABLEMENT WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY, AND (B)THEREAFTER FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE 1988 DEED RECIPIENTS SO LONG AS THEY REMAIN PERSONS INCAPACITATED BY OR OTHERWISE SUFFERING FROM VERY SEVERE DISABLEMENT AND IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY AND THUS FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING SUCH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS FOR SUCH PURPOSE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.