Dogfen lywodraethu HALEWOOD CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TEACHERS HOUSE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONVEYANCE DATED 8 AUGUST 1848 AND SCHEME OF 10 MARCH 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09 MAR 2023 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED ON 15 AUG 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL CURRENTLY KNOWN AS HALEWOOD CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY ACADEMY (OR ANY SUCCESSOR SCHOOL, BEING A SCHOOL WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATIONS ACTS AS DEFINED BY S578 OF THE EDUCATION ACT 1996) BY PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED, OR NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED, OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS, AS THEY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT. THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSULT SUCH PERSONS AS THEY SEE FIT BEFORE APPLYING THE FUNDS OF THE CHARITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.