Dogfen lywodraethu INTERNATIONAL FUND FOR ANIMAL WELFARE (IFAW)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 MAR 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAR 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 JUN 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08 AUG 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 OCT 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 FEB 2017 as amended on 06 Nov 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE WELFARE AND CONSERVATION OF ANIMALS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY REDUCING COMMERCIAL EXPLOITATION OF ANIMALS, HELPING ANIMALS IN CRISIS OR DISTRESS AND WORKING TO PREVENT CRUELTY AND SUFFERING TO WILD ANIMALS AND DOMESTIC ANIMALS; TO PROTECT, CONSERVE AND PRESERVE TERRESTRIAL AND MARINE WILDLIFE HABITATS AND TO EDUCATE POLICY MAKERS AND THE PUBLIC IN RESPECT OF THE FOREGOING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.