Dogfen lywodraethu PILGRIM HOSPITAL RADIO
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCTOBER 1993 AND AMENDED 19 FEBRUARY 2006 as amended on 25 Feb 2018 as amended on 22 Feb 2020 as amended on 25 Feb 2021 as amended on 21 Feb 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objectives of the Organisation shall be to preserve and protect the health of patients and staff of hospitals and similar establishments in Lincolnshire by providing a hospital radio service. In furtherance of this objective, the Organisation shall have the following powers: A] To provide programmes of interest to hospital patients. B] To make these programmes available to similar establishments not connected to the network. C] To co-operate locally, nationally and internationally with organisations of a similar constitution. D] To join and maintain membership of the Hospital Broadcasting Association.
Maes buddion
BOSTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.