Dogfen lywodraethu WILDFOWL AND WETLANDS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 23 DECEMBER 1993, 8 JUNE 1995, 21 JUNE 2001, 13 DECEMBER 2007, 11 DECEMBER 2008 AND 21 OCTOBER 2010 as amended on 25 Nov 2021 as amended on 10 Dec 2023 as amended on 22 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Trust’s objects are to restore, create and protect wetlands to enhance their value for wildlife; to undertake any activity that in the opinion of the Council raises awareness of wetlands, including their critical value to wildlife, to people and to the environment; undertake scientific research, provide evidence, learning and guidance to support these objects; to maintain any establishments and sites as the Council may think fit, to manage, restore, create and protect wetlands; to disseminate knowledge and understanding of wetlands and their wildlife and/or to inspire conservation action through recreational opportunities and engagement; and to operate in the UK and in all parts of the world.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.