Dogfen lywodraethu CHRISTIAN VISION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/07/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/1993 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/12/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/02/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2. RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. 4. OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND MORAL VALUES WITH THE EMPHASIS ON HONESTY AND INTEGRITY IN EVERY DAY LIFE AND IN BUSINESS.
Maes buddion
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.