Dogfen lywodraethu A GOOD INDEPENDENT DISABILITIES EDUCATION EMPLOYMENT ADVICE AND ADVOCACY AGENCY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 1993 AS AMENDED 10 JANUARY 1994, 28 FEBRUARY 1995 30 JANUARY, 26 MARCH 1996, 23 OCTOBER 1996, 28 JANUARY 1997, 25 FEBRUARY 1997 AND 24 FEBRUARY 2000.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY. (A) BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVOCACY SERVICE, TO EMPOWER THEM AND TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE INDEPENDENT DECISIONS AND TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO THE DISABLED, AND THEIR DISABILITIES AND TO THE NEEDS OF THE DISABLED..
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.