Dogfen lywodraethu CROSSROADS CARE STAFFORDSHIRE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/03/2010 as amended on 25 Mar 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Company's Objects are specifically restricted to the following:- (a) the relief of those in need by reason of age, ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage through the provision of comprehensive support services for carers throughout the County of Staffordshire; and (b) The assistance of carers in need including by raising awareness of issues affecting carers.
Maes buddion
STAFFORDSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.