Dogfen lywodraethu MERCURY MUSICAL DEVELOPMENTS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/05/2011 as amended on 01 Oct 2020 as amended on 20 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING THE UNDERSTANDING, APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MUSIC AND PRINCIPALLY THEATRICAL MUSIC ALSO KNOWN AS DRAMATICO-MUSICAL WORKS, MUSICAL THEATRE, MUSIC THEATRE, OPERA, CHAMBER OPERA, OPERETTA AND MUSICAL COMEDY IN ANY MEDIUM OR FORM FOR EVERY VARIETY OF ENSEMBLE AND FOR SOLO VOICES AND INSTRUMENTALISTS, EXPERIMENTAL, MECHANICAL, ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONIC, ACOUSTIC AND OTHER INSTRUMENTS AND SOURCES OF SOUND FOR PERFORMANCE IN A DRAMATIC MEDIUM OR ANY OTHER MEDIUM OR FORM WITH WHICH MUSIC MAY BE ASSOCIATED
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED ALTHOUGH IN PRACTICE LONDON AND SOUTH EAST ENGLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.