Dogfen lywodraethu THE INSTITUTION OF RAILWAY SIGNAL ENGINEERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/11/1912 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/04/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/2013 as amended on 27 Apr 2018 as amended on 02 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF SIGNALLING (WHICH SHALL MEAN THE WHOLE OF THE APPARATUS, ELECTRICAL, MECHANICAL OR OTHERWISE, METHODS, REGULATIONS AND PRINCIPLES WHEREBY THE MOVEMENT OF RAILWAY OR OTHER TRAFFIC IS CONTROLLED) BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH, THE COLLECTION AND PUBLICATION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL AND THE HOLDING OF CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND MEETINGS B) THE MAINTENANCE OF HIGH STANDARDS OF PRACTICE AND PROFESSIONAL CARE AMONGST THOSE WORKING WITHIN THE INDUSTRY AND PROMOTION OF IMPROVED SAFETY STANDARDS FOR THE PROTECTION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.