Dogfen lywodraethu QUEEN STREET SCHOOL PRESERVATION TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/08/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2013 as amended on 22 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. To preserve and maintain the former National & Infant School and the former Primitive Methodist Chapel, immediately adjacent to the School as an educational, heritage and community centre for the benefit of the people of Barton, visitors, schools and educational historians. 2. To acquire and maintain for the advancement of education a museum comprising a collection of artefacts for display and study purposes on the subject of the history of primary education, with particular reference to Samuel Wilderspin and his role in it, and the former Chapel.
Maes buddion
BARTON-UPON-HUMBER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.