Dogfen lywodraethu SUPPORT EDUCATION AND RESPITE CARE FOR CHILDREN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/07/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 NOV 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
CHARITABLE PURPOSES INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR SOCIAL WORK WITH OR WITHOUT ACCOMMODATION INVOLVING CHILDREN AND ADULTS AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR, AND THE ORGANISATION OF, AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.