Dogfen lywodraethu Link Education International
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/06/1995 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/01/2014 as amended on 06 Jul 2020 as amended on 15 Jun 2020 as amended on 03 Nov 2020 as amended on 03 Nov 2020 as amended on 03 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION AND/OR IMPROVEMENT AND /OR ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN AFRICA (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING (INCLUDING STARVATION, SICKNESS OR ANY PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR AFFLICTION) IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, WHETHER ARISING AS A RESULT OF DROUGHT, EARTHQUAKE, FLOOD OR OTHER NATURAL PHENOMENA OR BY REASON OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE 2 (A), (B) AND (C) OF MEMORANDUM
Maes buddion
AFRICA AND WORLD WIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.