Dogfen lywodraethu MARY HARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JULY 1995, AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2005 AND AGAIN BY MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 SEPT 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 NOV 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND/OR ADULTS WITH DISABILITIES RELATING TO COMMUNICATION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION DEAFNESS; AND (2) TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND PROVIDE TRAINING TO INDIVIDUALS AND TO OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS WHETHER OR NOT CHARITABLE IN LAW AND WHERESOEVER SITUATED AND TO PROFESSIONALS SUPPORTING THOSE ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE TECHNIQUES OF MULTI-SENSORY TEACHING AND THE TEACHING OF SENSORY IMPAIRED CHILDREN AND/OR ADULTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.