Dogfen lywodraethu ELITE SUPPORTED EMPLOYMENT AGENCY LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/05/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/01/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED PARTICULARLY IN SOUTH AND WEST WALES, BY REASON OF DISABILITY, YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY AIDING THEM TO ADVANCE INTO EMPLOYMENT AND IN PURSUING ANY OTHER OBJECTS FOR THE WELL-BEING OF THOSE PEOPLE WHICH ARE NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Maes buddion
RHONDDA CYNON TAFF, MERTHYR TYDFIL, BRIDGEND AND CAERPHILLY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.