Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRIGSTOWE PROJECT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1995 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 1995 (PRIOR TO INCORPORATION) AND 23 JULY 2001 AND 20 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 28 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED ON 14 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED ON 28 NOV 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 FEB 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, IN EACH CASE, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BUT NOT LIMITED TO BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS: 1. TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH LONG-TERM HEALTH CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO PEOPLE LIVING WITH OR AFFECTED BY HIV AND OTHER RELATED CONDITIONS, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, CONSULTANCY SERVICES, THROUGH PARTNERSHIPS AND / OR RESEARCH PROJECTS WITH BUSINESSES, CHARITIES, EDUCATION PROVIDERS AND LOCAL COMMUNITIES. 3. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY ELIMINATING DISCRIMINATION TOWARDS PEOPLE ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RELIGION OR BELIEF, SEX, AGE, PREGNANCY, RELATIONSHIP STATUS, OR ANY OTHER FORMS OF DISCRIMINATION 4. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PROVIDING, AMONGST OTHER THINGS, PEER SUPPORT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.