Dogfen lywodraethu BLACKBIRD LEYS NEIGHBOURHOOD SUPPORT SCHEME LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 NOVEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 OCTOBER 1995 as amended on 14 Jul 2021 as amended on 15 Sep 2021 as amended on 25 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICES CONCERNED WITH A WIDE RANGE OF ISSUES AFFECTING PERSONAL AND FAMILY WELL BEING INCLUDING WELFARE RIGHTS, HOUSING RIGHTS, GENERAL LEGAL RIGHTS, CONSUMER RIGHTS, MONEY ADVICE, GENERAL COUNSELLING AND INFORMATION REGARDING SERVICES PROVIDED BY OTHER STATUTORY VOLUNTARY BODIES. 2) TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND REFRESHMENT FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF BLACKBIRD LEYS.
Maes buddion
BLACKBIRD LEYS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.