Dogfen lywodraethu HMDT Music
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
INCORPORATED 25/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2012 as amended on 21 Mar 2022 as amended on 17 Jan 2023 as amended on 17 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects are restricted specifically for the public benefit: - to advance education in music and the arts, and - to promote music and the arts, in particular but not exclusively by the creation, development and provision of workshops, programmes and music-related projects for people, including young people and young offenders and particularly but without limitation those who are disadvantaged due to financial and/or other circumstances.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.