Dogfen lywodraethu YOUNG SUFFOLK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/09/1974 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/1995 AS AMENDED ON 27/11/2001 AS AMENDED ON 14/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SUFFOLK FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY ASSOCIATING THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, INSTITUTIONS AND MEMBER ORGANISATIONS OF THE CHARITY IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SUFFOLK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.