Dogfen lywodraethu THE TAOIST TAI CHI SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1996, 22 JUNE 2002, 4 DECEMBER 2005 AND 16 FEBRUARY 2008. as amended on 28 May 2021 as amended on 05 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH WITHIN THE COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT GREAT BRITAIN AND INTERNATIONALLY THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND PRACTICE OF ALL LEVELS OF TAOIST TAI CHI ARTS. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN TAOIST RELIGION, PHILOSOPHY, TRADITIONS AND ARTS AS PROMOTED BY THE SOCIETY'S FOUNDER MASTER MOY LIN SHIN
Maes buddion
GREAT BRITAIN AND INTERNATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.