Dogfen lywodraethu 1ST EARSHAM SCOUTS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1948, 18TH FEBRUARY 1959, 5TH MAY 1967 AND 19TH JULY 1991.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHUSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, A SINDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES. THE METHOD OF ACHIEVING THE AIM OF THE ASSOCIAITON IS BY PROVIDING AN ENJOYABLE AND ATTRACTIVE SCHEME OF PROGRESSIVE TRAINING, BASED ON THE SCOUT PROMISE AND LAW AND GUIDED BY ADULT LEADERSHIP.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.