Dogfen lywodraethu WESTMINSTER CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU SERVICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/11/2010 as amended on 12 Nov 2020 as amended on 20 Jul 2021 as amended on 20 Jul 2021 as amended on 20 Jul 2021 as amended on 02 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WESTMINSTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF WESTMINSTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.