Dogfen lywodraethu MRS JANE CART'S TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DEEDS OF LEASE AND RELEASE DATED RESPECTIVELY THE 22, AND 23 JUNE 1736, AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 16 JANUARY 1970, 15 AUGUST 1974, AND 10 FEBRUARY 1992. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18 SEP 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR CLERGY, THEIR SPOUSES, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND DEPENDANTS (2) UPKEEP OF A MONUMENT AND CLOCK IN DUNSTABLE PARISH CHURCH (3) A SERMON TO BE PREACHED IN DUNSTABLE PARISH CHURCH (4) FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RESIDENT IN DUNSTABLE EITHER IN GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY
Maes buddion
DUNSTABLE AND NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.