Dogfen lywodraethu WALBERSWICK COMMON LANDS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 4 JULY 1985 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 2 DECEMBER 1986, ORDER DATED 27 MARCH 2003 AND SCHEME DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 2009 as amended on 01 Nov 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN WALBERSWICK WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS RESIDUE OF THE INCOME FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WALBERSWICK AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
WALBERSWICK.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.