Dogfen lywodraethu SAMUEL WILSON'S LOAN CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 10TH MARCH 1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 7 FEBRUARY 1998 AND 4 MARCH 2011 AND AN ORDER DATED 30 NOVEMBER 2005. as amended on 13 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY; A) THE PROVISION OF LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS, PARTNERSHIPS AND COMPANIES PREPARING FOR OR ENGAGED IN ANY TRADE, MANUFACTURE, BUSINESS OR PROFESSION IN THE AREA COMPRISING GREATER LONDON AND THE COUNTIES OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, ESSEX, HERTFORDSHIRE, KENT, SURREY, EAST SUSSEX AND WEST SUSSEX; B) INVESTING IN SHARES OF COMPANIES PREPARING FOR OR ENGAGED IN ANY TRADE, MANUFACTURE, BUSINESS OR PROFESSION IN THE AREA COMPRISING GREATER LONDON AND THE COUNTIES OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, ESSEX, HERTFORDSHIRE, KENT, SURREY, EAST SUSSEX AND WEST SUSSEX.
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.